Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Anderson, Angel, Conaway, Ebersole, Gaines, Glenn, Kramer, Lam, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring at least 75% of packaged food and beverage options offered in a food and beverage vending machine located on property owned or managed by the State to be healthy food and beverage options; providing that specified packaged food and beverage options may not contain more than a specified amount of trans fat or a specified amount of sodium; requiring healthy food or beverage options to be displayed and stocked in a specified manner; establishing requirements that must be met to be considered a healthy food option; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0602
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-501 through 21-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM