Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, if a self-insured employer, insurer, or the Uninsured Employers' Fund has not waived third-party reimbursement, the Subsequent Injury Fund be reimbursed after the self-insured employer, insurer, or Uninsured Employers' Fund in a certain third-party action; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0979
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393696/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {393696/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48A
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text - Chapter - Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:33 AM