Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the authorized uses of the State Wildlife Management and Protection Fund; repealing specified requirements that the Department of Natural Resources use specified funds from specified hunting license sales for specified purposes; requiring a person who harvests a game bird or mammal to report the harvest in accordance with specified regulations; requiring a person who possesses a game bird or mammal killed by means other than hunting to report the possession in accordance with specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209, 10-308, 10-415, 10-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM