Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Response to a State Disaster or Emergency - Licensing and Taxes
Sponsored by
Delegate Hixson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified out-of-state businesses and out-of-state employees do not have a presence in the State that subjects the businesses or employees to specified licensing or registration requirements, income taxes, unemployment insurance contributions, personal property tax, or any requirement to collect and remit the sales tax; exempting specified businesses and employees from income taxes and withholding requirements; requiring specified businesses to provide a specified statement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1037
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {935262/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589435/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {935262/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {589435/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 62
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-203, 14-219 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM