Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Dwelling House of Disabled Veteran or Surviving Spouse - Repeal of Domicile Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Rudolph
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing, under provisions of law exempting from property tax the dwelling house owned by a surviving spouse of an individual who died in the line of duty, the requirement that the individual or the surviving spouse be domiciled in the State as of the date of the individual's death; repealing, under provisions of law exempting from property tax the dwelling house owned by a disabled veteran or specified surviving spouse, the requirement that the disabled veteran be domiciled in the State at death; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM