Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Evidence of Defendant's Past Conduct
Sponsored by
Delegate Braveboy
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing evidence of a defendant's past sex crime or past sex abuse of a minor to be admitted in specified prosecutions; requiring a prosecutor who intends to offer specified evidence to disclose the evidence to the defendant at least 15 days before trial or later if authorized by the court for good cause shown; authorizing a prosecutor to satisfy the disclosure requirement in a specified manner under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-319.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM