Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a criminal justice unit from presenting victims of sexually assaultive behavior with forms or verbal agreements purporting to limit the obligations of the criminal justice unit to the victim or limit the rights of the victim; prohibiting certain evidence from being introduced in certain court proceedings; authorizing victims affected by a violation of the Act to bring a certain action; requiring by January 1, 2021, each criminal justice unit to adopt a certain policy; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0807
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 12:10 PM