Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County Deputy Sheriffs Dailey and Logsdon Benefits Memorial Act
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from 18 years to 26 years the maximum age at which specified children of deceased members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System who are killed in the line of duty are no longer eligible to receive a specified death benefit; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to pay a specified death benefit under specified circumstances; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184068/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {184068/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58A
Post Passage 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM