Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending and altering the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill certain appropriations to the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund for certain fiscal years; altering certain requirements for certain individuals in certain positions funded by endowment proceeds; altering the distribution of certain revenue from the State admissions and amusement tax in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0389
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375160/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {375160/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-604, 6-612, 6-614, 6-618 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:41 PM