Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing Education
Sponsored by
Delegate Jones
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 784
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Cosmetologists, beginning on October 1, 2018, to require a licensee renewing a license to complete at least six credit hours of continuing education approved by the Board to qualify for the renewal of a license.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing Education
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing Education
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 784
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing Education
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing 4/03 at 4:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
Text - Third - State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing Education
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Miller) Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 784
Text - Chapter - State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing Education
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM