Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County Superintendents
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary and Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified county boards of education to remove a county superintendent of schools under specified circumstances; requiring a county superintendent who has been removed to be compensated subject to the terms of a specified contract or, if no such terms exist, for the remainder of the county superintendent's term.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County Superintendents
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:34 AM