Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker and Rose
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that certain provisions of law concerning the method of calculating a certain reduction in the State agricultural land transfer tax apply to a transfer under a contract of sale dated on or after July 1, 2019; clarifying that a certain exemption from the State agricultural land transfer tax applies to a transfer under a contract of sale dated on or after July 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/13/2020 4:40 PM