Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Anderson, Dumais, J. Lewis, A. Miller, Moon, Proctor, Sanchez, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court from entering an order or a judgment that conceals information related to a public hazard; prohibiting a court from entering an order or a judgment that conceals sexual harassment except under certain circumstances; providing that confidentiality provisions that conceal information related to a public hazard are unenforceable; providing that a substantially affected person, including news media, has standing to contest an order, a judgment, an agreement, or a contract that violates the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
Text - First - Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1201, 11-1205 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:15 PM