Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Busch, Arentz, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Carey, Chang, Cullison, Davis, Fennell, Frush, Hixson, Impallaria, Jameson, Kelly, Lam, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Metzgar, Miele, Moon, Morales, Platt, Robinson, Sanchez, Stein, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, K. Young, Branch, Clippinger, Frick, Lisanti, Mautz, and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting retail pet stores from offering for sale, transferring, or disposing of cats or dogs; repealing certain provisions of law that authorize the sale of certain cats and dogs and set forth the requirements for a retail pet store that offers to sell certain cats or dogs under certain circumstances; stating the intent of the General Assembly that animal welfare organizations initiate contact with retail pet stores to facilitate the showcasing of dogs and cats for adoption or for purchase from local breeders; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018, January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - No More Puppy-Mill Pups Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {213390/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {973520/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-11)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-8)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - No More Puppy-Mill Pups Act of 2018
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {213390/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Rey) Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Floor Amendment {973520/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected 46A
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46A
Text - Third - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2018)
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (123-11) 47
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {447276/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (129-8) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-701, 19-702, 19-702.1, 19-703, 19-704, 19-705, 19-706, 19-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM