Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Guzzone, Miller, King, McCray, Beidle, and West
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing sports wagering license holders to accept wagers on sporting events by certain methods and in certain locations; including in the authorized uses of the Problem Gambling Fund the implementation of free or reduced cost problem gambling programs targeted at issues related to sports wagering; requiring certain licensing fees; providing a 5-year license term; providing licensees and applicants are subject to minority business participation goals; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Sports Betting - Implementation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {489239/1
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {489239/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {533523/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gaming - Sports Betting - Implementation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {395168/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Patterson) Adopted (125-2)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-3)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Gaming - Sports Betting - Implementation
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments {489239/1 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 41
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {489239/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Floor Amendment {533523/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Gaming - Sports Betting - Implementation
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Ways and Means 44
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {395168/1 Adopted 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Patterson) Adopted (125-2) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-3) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:05 AM