Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Cyber Reserve within the Military Department; providing that the organized militia of the State includes the Reserve; providing the Governor is the commander-in-chief of the Reserve; establishing the mission of the Reserve to prevent and resolve certain cyber attacks; establishing qualifications for an individual to enlist in the Reserve; authorizing the Governor to requisition certain arms and equipment from the United States Secretary of Defense; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 11:51 AM