Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Brinkley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Frederick County to the list of counties in which specified nonprofit fraternal, religious, and war veterans' organizations may own and operate not more than five slot machines under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1362
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0036 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
8/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 8/13/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM