Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Hough, Elfreth, Hester, McCray, Ready, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to require an individual appointed by the Governor to fill a vacancy in the office of Delegate or Senator in the General Assembly to serve for the remainder of the term if the vacancy occurs after a certain date; requiring that a special election be held at the same time as a certain regular statewide election to fill a vacancy in the office of Delegate or Senator in the General Assembly if the vacancy occurs on or before a certain date; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0103
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0313 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/06/2019
Legislative Date
9/06/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {193425/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/06/2019 9/06/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable Adopted 14
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Floor Amendment {193425/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 14
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14
Text - Third - General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 16
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Referred Ways and Means 17
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 11:25 AM