Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified State agencies that are deemed electronic voter registration agencies to implement electronic voter registration systems on or before July 1, 2017; requiring the State Board of Elections to promptly register individuals whose voter registration information is transmitted to the State Board through an electronic voter registration system; providing that information related to an applicant's decision not to register electronically to vote may only be used for the maintenance of registration statistics; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/19/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704735/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 8/19/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {704735/1 Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-201, 3-202, 3-203, 3-204, 3-301, 3-302, 3-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM