Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Reilly, Beidle, and Elfreth
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Chesapeake Bay Bridge Reconstruction Advisory Group for the purpose of providing the Maryland Transportation Authority with an independent, citizen-informed perspective on the Authority's operations at the Chesapeake Bay Bridge; requiring the Advisory Group to assist the Authority in assessing potential concerns and educating the public about activity related to the bridge; requiring any entity that conducts a study related to the Chesapeake Bay Bridge to report its findings and recommendations to the Advisory Group; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0056
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967170/1
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable as Amended Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {403828/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Reconstruction Advisory Group and Traffic Study
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {967170/1 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable as Amended Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Floor Amendment {403828/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 32
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 33
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 1:23 PM