Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Manno, Feldman, McFadden, Ramirez, Pinsky, Benson, Rosapepe, Lee, King, Guzzone, Ferguson, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow specified individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; expanding eligibility of the credit to allow specified individuals without specified qualifying children to claim the credit; allowing specified individuals to claim the credit without regard to a specified age limitation; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0002
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0294 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/12/2016
Legislative Date
7/12/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/12/2016 7/12/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Expansion
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 2:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM