Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Web Sites - Language Access
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Conway, Pinsky, Bates, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, beginning on October 1, 2016, the reasonable steps specified departments, agencies, and programs are required to take under specified provisions of law include the operation and maintenance of equal access versions of specified Web sites in a language spoken by any limited English proficient population of at least .5% of the overall population within the State and that can be translated free-of-charge; requiring the Department of Information Technology to establish specified minimum standards; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/30/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854430/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {146885/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-33)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 9/30/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {854430/1 Report Adopted 20
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 22
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 24
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {146885/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-33) 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1102, 10-1103 through 10-1105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM