Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal Object
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified records that a secondhand precious metal object dealer or pawnbroker is required to keep for specified purposes to include a photograph of each precious metal object acquired or pawned; and providing that a secondhand precious metal object dealer or pawnbroker is not required to submit to a primary law enforcement unit or a local law enforcement unit a copy of a specified photograph except at the request of the primary law enforcement unit or local law enforcement unit.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/19/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/19/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable 14
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Special Order until 2/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 14
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 18
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-301, 12-302, 12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM