Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the District Court has concurrent jurisdiction with the circuit courts over proceedings under certain provisions of law regarding liens for unpaid wages and has the powers of a court in equity in those proceedings; authorizing a certain employer to dispute a lien for unpaid wages by filing a complaint in the District Court sitting in the county where property of an employer is located; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2017
Legislative Date
10/26/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2017 10/26/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court Jurisdiction
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1102 through 3-1105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM