Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Decreasing the State corporate income tax rate from 8.25% to 8.0% for tax year 2019, 7.5% for tax year 2020, and 7.0% for tax year 2021 and beyond.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1139
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/16/2018 11/16/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM