Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Governor - Approval of Duplicative Bills
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, within the time prescribed by law after its presentment, the Governor to approve a bill if the bill is duplicative of a bill that the Governor approves from the same regular or special session of the General Assembly.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2015 1/21/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1509.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM