Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Noxious Weeds - Reed Grass
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Classifying reed grass (phragmites australis) as a noxious weed subject to investigation, abatement, eradication, and general regulation under the direction of the Maryland Department of Agriculture.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/21/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/21/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
(   9-401, 9-402 through 9-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page