Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel – Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax to include certain retirement income attributable to a resident's employment with the District of Columbia as a law enforcement officer or member of a fire, rescue, or emergency services organization; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/14/2017
Legislative Date
11/14/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/14/2017 11/14/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel – Eligibility
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM