Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from shipping, importing, or selling into or within the State an electronic smoking device to which an artificial or natural flavoring, other than tobacco, is added to impart a particular aroma or taste; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2019
Legislative Date
9/23/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2019 9/23/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Electronic Smoking Devices - Added Flavoring - Prohibition on Shipping, Import, or Sale
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   16.7-213, 16.7-214 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page