Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a store from distributing plastic disposable carryout bags free of charge to a customer at the point of sale; requiring a store to charge and collect a 10-cent fee for each paper disposable carryout bag the store provides to a customer; authorizing the store to pay a customer a credit of at least 5 cents for each bag provided by the customer; requiring a store to remit to the Comptroller the money retained by the store for specified purposes; establishing a maximum penalty of $100 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0031
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0620 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/04/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 11/04/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM