Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax Cap - Amount and Repeal of Termination
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making permanent a $15,000 limit on the amount of the vessel excise tax that may be imposed on any vessel; and requiring that the maximum amount of the excise tax imposed for any vessel be increased by $100 on July 1, 2016 and July 1 of each subsequent year.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0014
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/04/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {655561/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (113-25)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 11/04/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 23
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {655561/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (113-25) 52
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Passed Enrolled 51
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 656
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM