Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain wages paid by certain small businesses during the taxable year to certain minimum wage employees under certain circumstances; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor, on application by a small business, to issue a tax credit certificate in a certain amount; requiring the Department to report to the Comptroller, on or before January 31 each year, on the tax credit certificates issued; requiring the Department and the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM