Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a jurisdiction that uses a pretrial risk scoring instrument to assist in determining the eligibility for pretrial release of an individual charged with a crime to have an independent validation study of the instrument conducted at least once every 5 years; making an independent validation study conducted in accordance with the Act for a certain instrument used in a certain pretrial services program eligible for funding from the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0049
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {408072/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pretrial Risk Assessment Instruments
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {408072/1 Adopted 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Pretrial Risk Scoring Instruments
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Referred Judiciary 24
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 12:11 PM