Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish guidelines for the training of employees to become trained diabetes care providers; providing the purpose of the Student Diabetes Management Program is to have trained employee volunteers available to provide diabetes care services to diabetic students during school hours and at school activities; establishing that a trained diabetes care provider providing care services is not civilly liable under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0771
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0672 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204832/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {395262/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senators Young, Nathan-Pulliam, and Bates
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Delegates D. Barnes, Shoemaker, and Patterson
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/06/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {204832/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {395262/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senators Young, Nathan-Pulliam, and Bates 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Refuses to Recede 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Delegates D. Barnes, Shoemaker, and Patterson 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-438, 7-439 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM