Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing November 1 as the legal State holiday of Maryland Emancipation Day; and making Maryland Emancipation Day a public school holiday, a bank holiday, and a State employee holiday.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM