Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $15,000 the maximum amount of a claim against the Home Improvement Guaranty Fund for which the Maryland Home Improvement Commission may issue a proposed order without a hearing.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
11/02/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774935/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 11/02/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {774935/1 Report Adopted 14
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 16
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 18
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM