Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Comptroller)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting certain feminine hygiene products from the sales and use tax.
Committees
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0095 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/21/2017
Legislative Date
9/21/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {689739/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/21/2017 9/21/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {689739/1 Adopted 17
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 19
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Referred Ways and Means 20
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM