Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Sale and Distribution of Products Containing NMP and DCM - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2021, the sale or distribution, through a retail establishment, of any paint or coating removal product that contains N-Methylpyrrolidone or methylene chloride, also known as dichloromethane, for noncommercial use; and establishing that a person that violates the provision or certain regulations adopted to carry out the provision will incur a warning for a first offense, a civil penalty of $500 for the second offense, and a civil penalty of $1,000 for subsequent offenses.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0299
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1138 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/13/2018
Legislative Date
11/13/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/13/2018 11/13/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Sale and Distribution of Products Containing NMP and DCM - Prohibition
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {987172/1 Adopted 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Text - Third - Public Health - Sale and Distribution of Products Containing NMP and DCM - Prohibition
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 30
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 32
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM