Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement Fund
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office of Crime Control and Prevention)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the School Bus Safety Enforcement Fund to be the School Safety Enforcement Fund; expanding the purposes of the Fund to include enhancing school safety; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to consider the geographic distribution of grant recipients before making a grant from the Fund; prohibiting a law enforcement agency or board of education from using a grant to fund the installation or maintenance of a speed monitoring system in or around a school zone; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
9/29/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {658277/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2015 9/29/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {658277/1 Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations 23
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201 through 4-204 )
(   17-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM