Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the court, on motion of a party filed within 18 months after a final decree of absolute divorce is entered, to change the name of the requesting party to either the name given the party at birth or any other former name the party wishes to use under specified circumstances; and specifying that provisions of law relating to a change of name do not apply to a change of name in connection with a decree of absolute divorce.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0793
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1183 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/03/2016
Legislative Date
11/03/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/03/2016 11/03/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 14
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 14
Text - Third - Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Judiciary 18
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM