Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects, subject to specified exceptions, to require licensees renewing a license to practice landscape architecture for a second or subsequent time to demonstrate continuing professional competency by completing a specified number of hours of professional development activities approved by the Board; and requiring the Board to waive specified continuing professional competency requirements for license renewal under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
11/02/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 11/02/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/11/2013 1/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM