Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan (Chair, Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds) and Senator Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from October 1 to October 20 the day by which the Capital Debt Affordability Committee must submit an estimate of the total amount of new State debt that may be authorized for the next fiscal year.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/18/2018
Legislative Date
10/18/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2019
Legislative Date
1/03/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/18/2018 10/18/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 15
Text - Third - Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Referred Appropriations 18
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text - Chapter - Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Annual Estimate
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM