Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of the standard deduction allowed under the Maryland income tax; providing that a certain cost-of-living adjustment applicable to the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of certain standard deductions applies beginning with taxable year 2020; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0271
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/16/2018 11/16/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-217 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:35 AM