Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Mathias, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the contents of a renewal application for a continuing care retirement community by requiring that actuarial studies reviewed by qualified actuaries be submitted at least every 3 years and 5 years for specified continuing care agreements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0282
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0276 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-401, 10-413 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM