Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to operate or give permission to operate a vessel for certain purposes in a slalom ski course located in a controlled water ski area in Maynadier Creek during certain times on certain days; prohibiting a person from operating or giving permission to operate a vessel for certain purposes in a slalom ski course located in a controlled water ski area in Maynadier Creek on Saturdays or State holidays; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report on the Act's implementation by December 1, 2022; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534433/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {460019/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {563325/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (27-108)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-50)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Senate 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {534433/1 Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 36
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {460019/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Floor Amendment {563325/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (27-108) 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (87-50) 63
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Area in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-725.1, 8-725.1 through 8-725.7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM