Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods
Sponsored by
Senators Reilly, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for instruction by a licensed health care provider on fertility awareness-based methods; prohibiting the insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from applying a copayment, coinsurance requirement, or deductible to coverage for the instruction on fertility awareness-based methods, except with respect to a specified grandfathered exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2017
Legislative Date
1/12/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537974/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2017 1/12/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {537974/1 Adopted 32
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 37
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-826.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM