Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products - Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a person who is licensed under a specified provision of law to act as a cigarette subwholesaler from the requirement that an applicant for a license to act as an other tobacco products wholesaler pay a specified license fee.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0182
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/11/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2013 1/11/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/11/2013 1/11/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 13
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 13
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 15
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 17
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM