Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain carrier to provide an open enrollment period for eligible employees and dependents who gain access to new qualified health plans as a result of a permanent move and who had coverage for prenatal care or services or had medically needy coverage as described in certain federal regulations for 1 or more days during the 60 days before the date of the permanent move.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/09/2019
Legislative Date
9/09/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/09/2019 9/09/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 42A
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49B
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:36 AM