Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to designate the authority to approve certain reservoir, dam, or waterway obstruction plans and specifications; and requiring the Department's designee to notify the Department of the approval of certain ponds.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2017
Legislative Date
10/31/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/31/2017 10/31/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval Authority
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Favorable Adopted 8
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Second Reading Passed 8
Text - Third - Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval Authority
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 10
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 11
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text - Chapter - Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval Authority
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM