Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug Treatment
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the use of a firearm in the commission of a certain felony or other crime of violence constitutes a crime of violence; altering the circumstances under which sexual abuse of a minor is a crime of violence; eliminating parole eligibility for certain violent offenders; adding to a list of convictions that may be expunged under certain circumstances; providing that a petition for expungement may not be filed earlier than 15 years after the person satisfies the sentences for all convictions for which expungement is requested; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0510 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/15/2017
Legislative Date
11/15/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {338771/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {492812/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {752117/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {743924/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Rejected
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Angel) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {253720/1 (Delegate Angel) Rejected
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-31)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-7)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug Treatment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/15/2017 11/15/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {338771/1 Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Time for Filing
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Judiciary 23
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {492812/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {752117/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {743924/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Rejected 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Angel) Adopted 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {253720/1 (Delegate Angel) Rejected 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (107-31) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (38-7) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug Treatment
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug Treatment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101 )
(   8-505, 8-506, 8-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM